|
06/29/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1268.)
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|