|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 2122.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1366.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|