07/01/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/18/2009 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2026.) | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1941.). (Corrected September 3.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |