|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2069.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1554.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|