California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 1, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 13, 2009
Bill June 15, 2009