06/29/2009 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/29/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/28/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21). | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |