|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4782.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2191.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2059.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2059.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1681.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|