02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/07/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |