02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/30/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/29/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 27). | |||
04/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/16/2009 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |