|
06/24/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 20. Page 3916.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|