California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2009

Amended

Bill July 13, 2009
Bill June 24, 2009
Bill April 29, 2009