06/18/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 1923.) | |||
05/26/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21). | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |