|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2755.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1921.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|