California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2009

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 6, 2010

Amended

Bill April 28, 2010
Bill January 14, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010
Bill May 7, 2009