California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2009

Amended

Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 13, 2009
Bill June 16, 2009