|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 1916.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 1352.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|