|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 3401.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 19. Page 2436.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2070.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|