|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 6905.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 5007.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Cedillo.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 5.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2071.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|