|
07/16/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1756.) In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 2019.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1984.).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|