02/02/2010 | Died on inactive file. | |||
08/17/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1922.). | |||
05/26/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 20). | |||
05/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/12/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |