02/02/2010 | Died on inactive file. | |||
08/17/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20). | |||
05/07/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/06/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/05/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |||
04/21/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |