California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Amended

Bill August 31, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill May 7, 2009
Bill April 16, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009