|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1366.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|