02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |