|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3815.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|