02/02/2010 | Died on inactive file. | |||
06/03/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Swanson. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |