02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/21/2009 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and TRANS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |