LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1431
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1431
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1431
Compare Versions
AB1431 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1431 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB1431 Amended August 30, 2010
AB1431 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1431 Amended April 27, 2010
AB1431 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1431 Amended March 9, 2010
AB1431 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1431 Amended April 14, 2009
AB1431 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1431 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1431 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB1431 Amended August 30, 2010
AB1431 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1431 Amended April 27, 2010
AB1431 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1431 Amended March 9, 2010
AB1431 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1431 Amended April 14, 2009
AB1431 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare