BILL NUMBER: AB 1435ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member V. Manuel Perez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Brownley, Solorio, and Torlakson) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 52052.7 to the Education Code, relating to public school accountability. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1435, V. Manuel Perez. Public school accountability. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish an advisory committee to advise on all appropriate matters relative to the creation of the Academic Performance Index and the implementation of the Immediate Intervention/Underperforming Schools Program and the High Achieving/Improving Schools Program. Existing law requires the committee to make recommendations to the Superintendent, by July 1, 2005, on the appropriateness and feasibility of a methodology for generating a measurement of academic performance by using unique pupil identifiers and annual academic achievement growth to provide a more accurate measure of a school's growth over time. This bill would require the advisory committee, by July 1, 2010, to make recommendations to the Superintendent regarding the inclusion of the results of the English language development test or series of tests developed or acquired pursuant to a specified provision and the feasibility of including English learner proficiency as part of the Academic Performance Index (API). The bill would require the Superintendent, with the approval of the state board, to include the results of the English language development test or series of tests developed or acquired pursuant to a specified provision and English language proficiency levels and growth of those levels in the API. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 52052.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 52052.7. By July 1, 2010, the advisory committee established pursuant to Section 52052.5 shall make recommendations to the Superintendent regarding the inclusion of the results of the English language development test or series of tests developed or acquired pursuant to Section 60810 and the feasibility of including English learner proficiency as part of the Academic Performance Index (API). The Superintendent, with the approval of the state board, shall include the results of the English language development test or series of tests developed or acquired pursuant to Section 60810 and English language proficiency levels and growth of those levels in the API.