LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1436
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1436
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1436
Compare Versions
AB1436 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1436 Enrolled September 1, 2010
AB1436 Amended June 23, 2010
AB1436 Amended May 11, 2010
AB1436 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1436 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1436 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1436 Enrolled September 1, 2010
AB1436 Amended June 23, 2010
AB1436 Amended May 11, 2010
AB1436 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1436 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare