|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 5733.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 3944.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on F. & A. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 1669.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|