LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1442
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1442
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1442
Compare Versions
AB1442 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1442 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB1442 Amended August 20, 2009
AB1442 Amended August 17, 2009
AB1442 Amended July 15, 2009
AB1442 Amended June 28, 2009
AB1442 Amended June 15, 2009
AB1442 Amended April 30, 2009
AB1442 Amended April 2, 2009
AB1442 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1442 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1442 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB1442 Amended August 20, 2009
AB1442 Amended August 17, 2009
AB1442 Amended July 15, 2009
AB1442 Amended June 28, 2009
AB1442 Amended June 15, 2009
AB1442 Amended April 30, 2009
AB1442 Amended April 2, 2009
AB1442 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare