|
08/05/2010
|
From Senate committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1769.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|