California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 3, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010
Bill March 31, 2009