|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Corrected June 23.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Yee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1447.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|