California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1455 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/23/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1455AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill  (   Coauthors:   Senators   Alquist,   Liu,   Romero,  and Simitian   )  FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 78016.6 to the Education Code, relating to the San Mateo County Community College District. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1455, as amended, Hill. San Mateo County Community College District Baccalaureate Partnership Act. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. Existing law authorizes the establishment of community college districts under the administration of community college district governing boards, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction at community college campuses throughout the state. Existing law establishes the California Community College Baccalaureate Partnership Program to encourage baccalaureate degree-granting institutions to partner with community colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs entirely on participating community college campuses and provides for up to 2 grants, not to exceed $50,000 each, to collaboratives formed for this purpose. This bill would establish the San Mateo  County  Community College District Baccalaureate Partnership Program to encourage baccalaureate degree-granting institutions to partner with the San Mateo County Community College District to offer baccalaureate degree programs on the district's community college campuses. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (1) Since its adoption in 1960, the Master Plan for Higher Education has served the state exceedingly well, allowing California to create the largest and most distinguished higher education system in the nation. A key component of the Master Plan for Higher Education is the differentiation of mission and function among the three systems of higher education in the state: the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges. (2) Until recently, this differentiation of function has allowed California to provide universal access to postsecondary education while preserving quality. (3) Due to current economic realities and a high unemployment rate in the state, tens of thousands of unemployed or underemployed Californians are entering or returning to college to improve job skills or to train for new careers. (4) In the rapidly emerging "knowledge economy" of California, it is more important than ever before that California have a well-educated populace in order for the state to remain competitive nationally and internationally. Several recent studies have concluded that a college degree is now required for most of the highest paying occupations and that, in many areas of the economy, the baccalaureate degree is replacing the associate degree as the entry level credential for 21st century jobs. (5) Community college students who want to transfer to public four-year institutions face a number of challenges: students are place bound and do not have the time or money to travel to four-year colleges; students are accepted, but do not get the financial aid packages that make enrollment possible; each four-year college or university has different entrance requirements that limit student options for transfer if they are not accepted into their first choice university. (b) Because of these factors, the State of California supports the increased use of "university centers" where the California State University and the University of California partner with the California Community Colleges to deliver baccalaureate degree programs on community college campuses. SEC. 2. Section 78016.6 is added to the Education Code, to read: 78016.6. (a) This section shall be known and may be cited as the San Mateo County Community College District Baccalaureate Partnership Act. The San Mateo  County  Community College District Baccalaureate Partnership Program is hereby established to do the following: (1) To encourage baccalaureate degree-granting institutions to partner with the San Mateo County Community College District to offer baccalaureate degree programs that will offer instruction entirely on the district's participating campuses. (2) To bring opportunities to earn baccalaureate degrees to San Mateo County, especially within areas of the county with limited access to baccalaureate degree-granting institutions. (b) The San Mateo County Community College District is hereby authorized to seek collaborative partnerships with the University of California and the California State University for purposes of offering baccalaureate degree programs on campuses of the San Mateo County Community College District.  (c) This section does not exempt any partnership program that may be proposed pursuant to this section from review by the California Postsecondary Education Commission pursuant to Section 66902 or any other applicable law.