|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|