|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1459.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1767.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1234.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|