|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2751.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1926.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1631.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|