|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2011.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Simitian.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1237.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|