06/17/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1865.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/01/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18). | |||
03/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/10/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
01/23/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. To print. |