02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/13/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/01/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
01/23/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. To print. |