|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|