02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 27). | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |||
04/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and NAT. RES. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |