LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1503
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1503
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1503
Compare Versions
AB1503 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB1503 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB1503 Amended August 19, 2010
AB1503 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1503 Amended June 16, 2010
AB1503 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1503 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB1503 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB1503 Amended August 19, 2010
AB1503 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1503 Amended June 16, 2010
AB1503 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare