|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended. (Corrected December 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 6.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|