|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2662.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1844.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|