|
08/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From inactive file. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Cedillo.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1. Page 1463.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|