California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2009

Amended

Bill September 4, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 15, 2009