California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 16, 2009
Bill June 29, 2009
Bill April 20, 2009